Curry v. Capital One Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Benny R. Curry
Defendant: Capital One Bank, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv00649
Filed: July 10, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., and the claims against it are dismissed with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs, attorneys' fees, and expenses. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The clerk of the court may close this case. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 11/9/09. (br, )
October 13, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that pursuant to the 22 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal, defendant Capital One Bank, N.A., and the claims against it are dismissed with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs, attorneys' fees, and expenses. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 10/13/2009. (br, )
September 3, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that pursuant to the notice of dismissal 13 , defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC, and the claims against it are dismissed with prejudice. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 9/3/09. (br, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curry v. Capital One Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benny R. Curry
Represented By: Anthony B. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?