Couch v. Lawrence (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Casey Lynn Couch
Defendant: Mr. Lawrence
Case Number: 2:2009cv00740
Filed: August 5, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: O Office
County: Elmore
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: O
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION adopting the 18 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge; dismissing Defendant Lawrence without prejudice for failure to effect service on this individual in accordance with applicable procedural rules; dismissing the case without prejudice since there are no defendants remaining to this cause of action. Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 3/11/2010. (br, )
February 18, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that: 1. Defendant Lawrence be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to effect service on this individual in accordance with applicable procedural rules; and 2. There being no defendants remaining to this cause of action, this matter be DISMISSED without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 3/3/2010. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 2/18/2010. (br, )
September 18, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that on or before 10/9/09 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $9.19 as an initial partial filing fee. The Clerk is directed to furnish a copy of this order to the inmate account clerk at the Julia Prison for Women. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 9/18/09. (sl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Couch v. Lawrence (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Lynn Couch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?