Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company v. Godbee Medical Distribution, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Godbee Medical Distribution, Inc. and Christy Caudle
Case Number: 2:2009cv00741
Filed: August 5, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Coody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2010 79 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER directing that the plaintiff's 32 motion for summary judgment is denied; further ordered that plaintiffs claim for a declaration that it has no duty to indemnify defendant Godbee Medical Distributors, Inc. for any damages in the underlying state lawsuit is dismissed as premature and without prejudice; further ORDERED that the parties are put on notice that the court is considering entering a summary judgment declaration in favor of defendant Godbee Medical Distributors, Inc. and against plaintiff Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company on plaintiff Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Companys duty to defend defendant Godbee Medical Distributors, Inc. in the underlying state lawsuit. The parties have until September 3, 2010, to submit any additional briefs and evidence on this issue. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 8/24/10. (scn, )
August 23, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 50 Motion to Strike, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 8/23/10. (scn, )
January 19, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: It is ORDERED that the 27 MOTION for Clarification is granted to the extent as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 1/19/2010. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company v. Godbee Medical Distribution, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel (Danny) Serenus Wolter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Godbee Medical Distribution, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy Caudle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?