Sanders v. Myrick et al (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: George J. Sanders, Jr.
Defendant: M. P. Myrick, S. E. Wilson and Keith Barnett
Case Number: 2:2009cv00771
Filed: August 14, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2013 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that, upon an independent review of the file in this case and upon consideration of the 125 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that: (1) The Recommendation of the Magistrate Jud ge is ADOPTED; (2) The 89 Motion for Summary Judgment with respect to the claims of excessive force against Officers Bascomb and Douglas is DENIED; (3) The Motion for Summary Judgment with respect to the remaining claims is GRANTED in favor of the defendants; (4) Magistrate Perguson, Former City of Montgomery Police Chief Baylor, and Officers Thornell, Wilson, Myrick, Wingard, and Barnett are DISMISSED as defendants in this case; (5) This case will be set for a jury trial on the plaintiffs claim of excessive force lodged against Officers Bascomb and Douglas. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 5/15/13. (scn, )
February 1, 2010 60 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 41 Amended Complaint filed by George J. Sanders, Jr., that: 1. The plaintiff's claims presented against Judge Sharon Yates be DISMISSED with prejudice in accordance with the directives of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)( 2)(B)(ii) and (iii). 2. The plaintiff's challenges to the constitutionality of the criminal charges pending against him before the Grand Jury of Montgomery County, Alabama be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. &# 167; 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) as such claims are not properly before the court at this time. 3. This case, with respect to the plaintiff's claims challenging the constitutionality of his arrest and the actions taken against him during the arrest, be referred back to undersigned for additional proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 2/16/2010. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 2/1/2010. (dmn)
August 18, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Holman Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 8/18/2009. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Myrick et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George J. Sanders, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. P. Myrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. E. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?