Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation v. Alliant Insurance Services, Inc.

Plaintiff: Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Alliant Insurance Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv00928
Filed: October 2, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 9, 2012 127 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that Alliant's Renewal of Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law 118 is GRANTED; that the Final Judgment 108 is VACATED. An appropriate final judgment will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/9/2012. (jg, )
March 14, 2011 94 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER ON PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Jury Selection set for 3/14/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2E before Honorable William Keith Watkins. Jury Trial set for 3/14/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2E before Honorable William Keith Watkins. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 3/14/2011. (br, )
February 8, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Jury Selection and Jury Trial, which is to last three days, is set for 3/14/2011, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 2E before Honorable William Keith Watkins; The parties shall file any requested voir dire questions, motions in limine fully briefed, and proposed jury instructions and proposed verdict forms with legal citations, on or before 2/28/2011; The opposing party is DIRECTED to file a response to any motion in limine on or before 3/6/2011; The parties are not require d to file trial briefs, but if they choose to do so, the briefs shall be filed on or before 2/28/2011; The parties shall jointly prepare and submit to chambers on or before 2/28/2011, three copies of a three-ringed binder of pre-marked exhibits, as further set out; All deadlines not otherwise affected by this order will remain as set forth in the 21 Uniform Scheduling Order, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 2/8/2011. (furn: Calendar, ar)(wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation v. Alliant Insurance Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Scott Michael Speagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliant Insurance Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?