Henderson v. Kilby Medical Staff et al (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Joseph Allen Henderson
Defendant: Kilby Medical Staff and Mrs. McMullen
Case Number: 2:2009cv00955
Filed: October 14, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that: 1) The 8 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED, and 2) This case be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure of the plf to prosecute this action. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 12/9/2009. (wcl, )
November 10, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Mag Judge that this case be dismissed without prejudice for failure of the plf to prosecute this action; Objections to R&R due by 11/24/2009. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 11/10/09. (djy, )
October 15, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Kilby Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 10/15/09. Furnished to cashier. (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. Kilby Medical Staff et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Allen Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilby Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. McMullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?