Walker v. Astrue

Plaintiff: David L. Walker
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 2:2009cv00960
Filed: October 15, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: (1) Defendant's 26 Motion to Alter Judgment Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) is GRANTED to the extent the check for attorney's fees shall be made payable to Plaintiff as the prevailing party. Said check shall be m ailed to plaintiff's counsel's address of record, in care of plaintiff. (2) The original award of $4,589.19 in attorneys fees and expenses remains subject to any right of offset the government may have under 31 U.S.C. § 3716 by vi rtue of any debt Plaintiff may owe to the United States. (3)The EAJA fees shall be paid promptly and within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. (4) Plaintiff's request for supplemental EAJA fees is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 9/6/2011. (dmn)
April 5, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that the Plaintiff's 20 Petition for Attorney Fees is GRANTED. Attorney fees and expenses in the amount of $4,589.19 shall be made payable to Plaintiff's attorney, subject to any right of offset the government may have under 31 U.S.C. § 3716 by virtue of any debt Plaintiff may owe to the United States. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 4/5/11. (scn, )
October 21, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER reversing and remanding the decision of the Commissioner with instructions that the ALJ incorporate Plaintiff's moderate limitation in maintaining concentration, persistence, and pace in his hypothetical to the Vocational Expert. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 10/21/2010. (br, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L. Walker
Represented By: Georgia Hidle Ludlum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?