Potts v. Thomas et al (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Curtis Potts
Defendant: Pike County Sheriff Department, Olivia Pearson and Russell Thomas
Case Number: 2:2009cv00974
Filed: October 19, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: O Office
County: Pike
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: O
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 10, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION; it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the 17 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and the same is hereby ADOPTED and that this case be and the same is DISMISSED without prejudice for plf's failures to comply with the orders of the court and to prosecute this action. Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 3/10/2010. (wcl, )
February 18, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be DISMISSED without prejudice for Plf's failures to comply with the orders of the court and to prosecute this action; Objections to R&R due by 3/3/2010. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 2/18/2010. (wcl, )
November 5, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that on or before 11/20/09 plf shall file an amended complaint on a form for use in filing a 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint, as further set out in order; further ORDERING that plf's amended complaint shall: (1) identiy specific claims relative to actions taken against him by those persons named as defs and list these claims in separate counts; (2) describe with clarity those factual allegations that are material to each specific count against the named defs; and (3) describe how the named defs violated his constitutional rights, as further set out in order (4) thru (6); directing the clerk to send plf a form to assist him. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 11/5/09. Mailed to plf with form, as directed.(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Potts v. Thomas et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pike County Sheriff Department
Represented By: Charles Fleming Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olivia Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Thomas
Represented By: Charles Fleming Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?