Hedges v. United States of America(INMATE 3)

Plaintiff: Bradley Stephen Hedges
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2009cv01000
Filed: October 29, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2012 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that (1) Mr. Hedges's 66 objections are OVERRULED; (2) Mr. Hedges's 66 motion in the alternative for post-hearing briefing and argument is DENIED; and (3) The 62 Recommendation that Mr. Hedges's 28 U.S.C. § 2255 motion be DENIED, because the claims therein entitle him to no relief, is ADOPTED, and this case is due to be DISMISSED with prejudice, as further set out. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/20/12. (scn, )
February 16, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 56 Motion for Subpoena, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 2/16/12. (scn, )
February 8, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 49 Motion to Continue Filing Deadline and Evidentiary Hearing. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 2/8/12. (scn, )
January 23, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that, upon consideration of the government's 44 Unopposed Motion to Continue Evidentiary Hearing and Lists of Witnesses and Exhibits Deadline, it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED; the evidentiary hearing currently schedule d for January 31, 2012, at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 5-A, Frank M. Johnson, Jr. United States Courthouse Complex, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama is RESCHEDULED for February 16, 2012 at 10:00 a.m.; the Clerk is DIRECTED to provide a court report er for this proceeding; further ORDERED that the deadline for exchange and filing of lists of witnesses and exhibits is reset for February 7, 2012. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 1/23/12. (Furnished to Calendar, KG, and Clerk of Court)(scn, )
January 11, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing as follows: (1.) The Federal Defender for the Middle District of Alabama is hereby appointed to represent Hedges on the issue set for an evidentiary hearing; (2.) Pursuant to this appointment and limited purpose, counsel shall proceed to confer with Hedges and otherwise make an appropriate investigation concerning the issue set for an evidentiary hearing; (3.) An evidentiary hearing is scheduled for January 31, 2012, at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 5-A, Frank M. Johnson, Jr. United St ates Courthouse Complex, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama; The Clerk is DIRECTED to provide a court reporter for this proceeding; (4.) Counsel for Hedges and counsel for the US shall exchange, and file with the court, lists of witnesses and exh ibits not later than January 24, 2012, as further set out; (5.) The Clerk is DIRECTED to serve this order upon the Federal Defender for the Middle District of Alabama and to make the case file available as reasonably requested. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 1/11/12. (Federal Defender added as Counsel for Plaintiff Hedges)(Furnished to Calendar, KG, and Clerk of Court.)(scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hedges v. United States of America(INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Stephen Hedges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Nathan D. Stump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?