Guarantee Company of North America USA v. W.D. Wainwright & Sons, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Guarantee Company of North America USA
Defendant: W.D. Wainwright & Sons, Inc., Stephen R. Wainwright, Sheryl B. Wainwright, William J. (Jeff) Wainwright, Tracye Wainwright, Denise Poole, RLI Insurance Company and First Community Bank of Central Alabama
Case Number: 2:2009cv01003
Filed: October 30, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2011 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties have notified the Court that Defendants Jeff and Tracye Wainwright have reached a settlement agreement with the Plaintiff Guarantee Company of North America USA. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties who have reach ed a settlement shall file a joint stipulation of dismissal no later than June 17th, 2011. It is further ORDERED that all parties' deadlines for filing trial briefs and proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law are CANCELLED. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 6/15/2011. (jg, )
May 19, 2011 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Wainwrights have until May 31, 2011 to file their contact information with the Court or cause a new attorney to make an appearance in the case. The parties are advised that the hiring of new counsel will not be grounds for continuing t he trial or pretrial settings in this case. The pretrial conference is currently scheduled for June 2, 2011. The Court notes that alongside Joseph Saloom, Nancy Kirby is listed as counsel of record for Stephen Wainwright. If it is not Ms. Kirby's intention to represent Stephen Wainwright at trial, it is further ORDERED that she file a notice with the Court clarifying the status of her representation by May 31, 2011. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Fuller on 5/19/2011. (jg, )
May 18, 2011 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 125 Plaintiff's Motion to Reinstate Stephen Wainwright as a defendant in this action is GRANTED. The Court has been notified that Mr.Wainwright does not oppose this motion. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to reinstate Mr. Wainwright as a defendant in this case. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 5/18/2011. (jg, )
May 5, 2011 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that this cause is before the Court on Guarantee Company of North America USA's ("Guarantee") Motion to Reinstate Stephen R. Wainwright as a defendant in this action. (Doc. 125 ); that any party, including Stephen Wainwright, wh o opposes this motion show cause by May 13, 2011 why this motion should not be granted. that the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to send a copy of this order and Guarantee's Motion to Reinstate 125 to Stephen Wainwright's counsel of record, Kirby and Joseph Saloom. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 5/5/2011. (jg, )
October 30, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the request for Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED; that the petition for Preliminary Injunction is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Terry F. Moorer so that he may expeditiously set a hearing on the request for preliminary injunction and provide a report and recommendation on the merits of that request. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 10/30/2009. (cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guarantee Company of North America USA v. W.D. Wainwright & Sons, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guarantee Company of North America USA
Represented By: Luther Graves Stiff, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.D. Wainwright & Sons, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen R. Wainwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl B. Wainwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J. (Jeff) Wainwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracye Wainwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RLI Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Community Bank of Central Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?