Franklin v. The Healthcare Authority for Baptist Health et al (MAG+)

Plaintiff: Nue Cheer Franklin
Defendant: Glenda Atilano, LeAnne Wadsworth, The Healthcare Authority for Baptist Health, Tommy Watkins, David Deneen, Steve Franks, Timothy Bode, Steve Searcy, Art Baylor, City of Montgomery Police Department, Wallace G. Falero, Grace Brown, Rebecca Williams and Janice Jackson
Case Number: 2:2009cv01075
Filed: November 24, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: O Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: O
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2010 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This cause is now before the Court on the plaintiff's 79 Notice of Appeal filed by Nue Cheer Franklin which the Court construes to contain a MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Applying the foregoing standard as further set ou t in the order, this Court is of the opinion that the plaintiff's appeal is without a legal or factual basis and, accordingly, is frivolous and not taken in good faith. It is ORDERED that the plaintiff's motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is DENIED and that the appeal in this cause is certified, pursuant to Title 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a), as not taken in good faith. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 9/24/2010. (dmn)
March 10, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that: 1) The 52 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; 2) The plf's 39 Motion to Add Gregory William Gill as a dft is DENIED; This case is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 3/10/2010. (wcl, )
February 16, 2010 52 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Mag Judge that that plf's 39 MOTION to add Gill as a defendant be DENIED; Objections to R&R due by 3/1/2010. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 2/16/2010. (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. The Healthcare Authority for Baptist Health et al (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenda Atilano
Represented By: Charles Mark Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LeAnne Wadsworth
Represented By: Charles Mark Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Healthcare Authority for Baptist Health
Represented By: Charles Mark Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Watkins
Represented By: Charles Mark Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Deneen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Franks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Bode
Represented By: Charles Mark Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Searcy
Represented By: Stacy Lott Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Art Baylor
Represented By: Stacy Lott Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Montgomery Police Department
Represented By: Stacy Lott Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace G. Falero
Represented By: Charles Mark Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Brown
Represented By: Charles Mark Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Jackson
Represented By: James Edward Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nue Cheer Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?