Bell et al v. Riley et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Darrius Bryant Bell and James Edward Spencer
Defendant: Bob Riley, Troy King, Cynthia Dillard and Richard Allen
Case Number: 2:2009cv01076
Filed: November 24, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Bullock
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 45 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; that Plaintiff's 46 Objection is OVERRULED; that Defendants' 25 and 30 motions for summary judgment on Plaintiff's § 1983 conditions of confinement, equal protection, and classification claims are GRANTED; that Plaintiff's challenge to the legality of his current incarceration is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii); that Plaintiff's challenge to the Alabama Community Notification Act ("ACNA") is DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; that an appropriate final judgment will be entered. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 7/9/2012. (cc, )
January 25, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 10 Amended Complaint filed by Darrius Bryant Bell that: 1. Plaintiff's challenge to the revocation of his probation be DISMISSED without prejudice in accordance with the directives of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii); and 2. This case be referred back to the undersigned for further proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 2/8/2010. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 1/25/2010. (dmn)
December 7, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; and granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at the Bullock Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 12/7/2009. (cb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell et al v. Riley et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrius Bryant Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edward Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?