Sykes v. Baker et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Christopher Fitzgerald Sykes
Defendant: Nurse Whitehead, V. Quin and Marianne Baker
Case Number: 2:2009cv01140
Filed: December 17, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: O Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: O
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 23, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING the 15 RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge and dismissing the case without prejudice due to Plaintiff's failures to comply with the orders of this Court and to prosecute this cause of action. Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 6/23/2010. (br, )
April 6, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before April 20, 2010 Plaintiff shall furnish the clerk's office with the correct address for Defendant Quin. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 4/6/2010. (br, )
March 5, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before March 22, 2010 Plaintiff shall amend his 1 complaint to provide the following additional factual information: 1. Identify specific claims relative to actions taken against him by the named defendants and list these claims in separate counts; 2. Describe with clarity those factual allegations that are material to each specific count against the named defendant(s); and 3. Describe how each named defendant violated his constitutional rights. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 3/5/2010. (br, )
January 5, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $7.23 be paid on or before 1/26/2010; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Easterling Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr. on 1/5/2010. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sykes v. Baker et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Quin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marianne Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Fitzgerald Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?