Willis v. Santa Fe Protective Services, Inc.

Plaintiff: Cynthia Willis
Defendant: Santa Fe Protective Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv01154
Filed: December 22, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Dale
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that upon consideration of the parties' 65 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal, which comports with Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, this action has been dismissed by operation of Rule 41, on the terms set out by the parties; that the clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 3/16/2011. (cc, )
March 1, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the parties file a joint stipulation of dismissal, in accordance with Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) FRCP, on or before 3/14/2011; further ORDERED that this case is REMOVED from the 3/14/2011 term of court in Montgomery, Alabama, and that the parties are RELIEVED from complying with all impending trial deadlines. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 3/1/2011. (furn: Calendar, ar)(term: Jury Trial for 3/14/2011, at 10AM)(wcl, )
February 15, 2011 63 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING Santa Fe's 30 motion for summary judgment, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 2/15/11. (Attachments: # 1 civil appeals checklist)(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willis v. Santa Fe Protective Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Willis
Represented By: Charles Neville Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Fe Protective Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?