Owuor v. Autauga County Commission et al (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Peter Makusi Otemba Owuor
Defendant: Autauga County Commission, Herbie Johnson and Larry Nixon
Case Number: 2:2009cv01160
Filed: December 23, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Elmore
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that on or before September 14, 2012 the defendants shall file a supplement to these reports, supported by an affidavit, which addresses the plaintiff's claims that while in the holding cell from November 6, 2008 until November 2 6, 2008 he was denied access to a shower, subjected to filthy conditions, deprived of a bed and denied the ability to communicate with his attorney; further ORDERED that the plaintiff be granted until September 21, 2012 to file a response to the defendants' supplemental special report. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/6/12. (scn, )
February 23, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before March 15, 2010 the defendants shall file a supplement to 9 the special report, supported by an affidavit, which advises the number of occasions on which they opened the plaintiff's legal mail outside his presence and why they considered the particular piece(s) of such mail of a suspicious nature. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 2/23/2010. (br, )
January 19, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at the Elmore County Jail. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 1/19/2010. (br, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owuor v. Autauga County Commission et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Makusi Otemba Owuor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autauga County Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbie Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Nixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?