Rotton v. Slay

Plaintiff: Kevin Carl Tyler Rotton
Defendant: David Slay
Case Number: 2:2010cv00022
Filed: January 8, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Autauga
0 Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Slay's 19 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as further set out in the opinion and order. Count three of the 18 Amended Complaint is hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 12/22/2010. (dmn)
March 10, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 14 Unopposed Motion for Leave to amend his complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint on or before 3/12/2010. It is further ORDERED that Defendant's 7 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 3/10/2010. (dmn)
March 4, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to why plaintiff's 14 Motion for Leave to amend his complaint should not be granted; Show Cause Response due from defendant by 3/15/2010 no later than 5:00; that plaintiff may file a reply by no later than 5:00 p.m. on March 18, 2010. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 3/4/2010. (cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rotton v. Slay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Carl Tyler Rotton
Represented By: James Bernard Brannan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Slay
Represented By: Fred Lee Clements, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?