Fedonczak et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Jon Edward Fedonczak and Candace Leann Fedonczak
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, EMC Insurance Company and Kenneth Ray Grissom
Case Number: 2:2010cv00061
Filed: January 21, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 46 Partial Motion for Summary Judgment, as further set out. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 2/1/11. (scn, )
January 19, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the caption of this case is changed to reflect that this action is no longer pending against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company or against EMC Insurance Company. (See Doc. 59 ). The parties are directed to use the new caption as it appears on this Order for all future submissions to this Court. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 1/19/11. (scn, )
December 3, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that it is hereby ORDERED: (1) State Farm's 51 Motion to Opt Out is GRANTED; (2) EMC's 54 Motion to Opt Out is GRANTED; and (3) the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to remove Staet Farm and EMC as parties to this lawsuit. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 12/3/10. (scn, )
May 4, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The motions to transfer venue (Docs. 7 , 17 , & 19 ) are DENIED as further set out in the order. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 5/4/2010. (dmn)
February 18, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 7 Motion for Fourteen Extension Day Within Which to File Supplemental Affidavits in Support of Motion for Change of Venue is GRANTED; that Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company may file supplemental affidavits in suppo rt of its motion for change of venue no later than 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, March 3, 2010; that all parties except the moving party shall be required to show cause why Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company's 7 Motion to Trans fer Venue should not be granted by no later than 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, March 17, 2010; that Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company may file a reply by no later than 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, March 24, 2010. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 2/18/2010. (cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fedonczak et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Edward Fedonczak
Represented By: David Earl Allred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Leann Fedonczak
Represented By: David Earl Allred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Ray Grissom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?