Price v. Hunter et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Timothy Price
Defendant: Dr Plikton, D.O.N. Robinson, Dr Hunter, Dr Woodley and Dr Beachum
Case Number: 2:2010cv00130
Filed: February 17, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: O Office
County: Bullock
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: O
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 11, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the 10 RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate; transferring this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1404. Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 5/11/2010. (br, )
March 16, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that on or before 3/31/2010 plf shall file an amended complaint on a form for use in filing a 42 USC 1983 complaint; further ORDERING that plf's amended complaint shall: (1) specifically identify who the named defendants are: (2) identify specific claims, as further set out in order; (3) describe with clarity those factual allegations that are material to each specific count against the named defendant(s); and (4) describe how each named def violated plf's constitutional rights, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 3/16/10. (djy, )
February 19, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $5.60 be paid on or before March 12, 2010; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at the Bullock Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 2/19/2010. (br, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Hunter et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Plikton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.O.N. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Woodley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Beachum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?