Araiza v. Elmore County Commission et al (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Cody Allen Araiza
Defendant: Elmore County Commission, Bill Franklin, Sgt. Fox, Officer Potts and Mrs. Easterling
Case Number: 2:2010cv00163
Filed: February 25, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Elmore
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; The Magistrate Judge entered a Recommendation 19 in this case to whichno timely objections have been filed. After a review of the Recommendation, and after an independent review of the entire record, the Court believes that the Recommendatio n should be adopted. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice due to Plaintiffs failures to comply with the orders of this Court and to prosecute this action. A separate judgment shall issue. Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 7/9/2010. (jg, )
March 25, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; that Plaintiff's claims against the Elmore County Commission are DISMISSED with prejudice, prior to service of process, pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (iii);that the Elmore County Commission is DISMISSED as a defendant to this causeof action; and that this case, with respect to Plaintiff's claims against the remaining defendants, is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for appropriate proceedings. Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 3/25/2010. (jg, )
March 1, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; Plaintiff's claims against the Elmore County Commission be DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (iii); The Elmore County Commission b e DISMISSED as a defendant to this cause of action; and; This case, with respect to Plaintiff's claims against the remaining defendants, be referred back to the undersigned for appropriate proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 3/15/2010. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 3/1/2010. (jg, ) Modified on 3/1/2010 clarify text (jg, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Araiza v. Elmore County Commission et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Allen Araiza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elmore County Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Easterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?