Eddins v. Carter et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Tosjo Lashea Eddins
Defendant: Stanley Carter and Frank Albright
Case Number: 2:2010cv00188
Filed: March 3, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Elmore
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that: (1) The 8 Objection to the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is overruled; (2) The 6 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is adopted; and (3) That plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process pursuant to the directives of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 6/3/2010. (cb, )
April 20, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 5 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 4/20/2010. (wcl, )
March 4, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $33.83 be paid on or before 3/25/2010; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk Julia Tutwiler Prison for Women. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 3/4/2010. (furn: Cashier) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eddins v. Carter et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tosjo Lashea Eddins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Albright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?