Scharff v. Wyeth et al

Plaintiff: Kathleen Scharff
Defendant: Wyeth and Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv00220
Filed: March 11, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
0 Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2012 258 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 240 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 8/1/12. (scn, )
September 19, 2011 238 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/19/11. (scn, )
August 2, 2011 223 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that Defendants' 76 motion for partial summary judgment is GRANTED as to Plaintiff's negligence claim in Count I, and Counts II-VII in their entirety, and ruling is RESERVED on Defendants' causa tion argument, as further set out; further, pursuant to Rule 56(f) of the FRCP, and in the interests of judicial economy and the parties' resources, it is ORDERED that Mrs. Scharff SHOW CAUSE, on or before August 12, 2011, why summary judgment should not be granted on her remaining wanton failure to warn and wanton design claims; Wyeth shall respond on or before August 19, 2011. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 8/2/11. (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scharff v. Wyeth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Scharff
Represented By: Bryan Fredrick Aylstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?