Feagin v. Southern Health Partners et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Michael E. Feagin
Defendant: Diane W., Willard McWhorter, Annette Cain and Southern Health Partners
Case Number: 2:2010cv00252
Filed: March 22, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 11, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 18 Report and Recommendation and plaintiff's 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is denied. It is further ORDERED that this case is referred back to the magistrate judge for further appropriate proceedings. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 5/11/2010. (dmn)
March 25, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) The 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order is treated as both a motion for a temporary restraining order and a motion for preliminary injunction. (2) The 3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is denied. (3) The MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is referred to the magistrate judge for consideration. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 3/25/2010. (dmn)
March 24, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Covington County Jail. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 3/24/2010. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feagin v. Southern Health Partners et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane W.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willard McWhorter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annette Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Health Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E. Feagin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?