Watkins v. Easterling Correctional Center et al (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Tyre T. Watkins
Defendant: Easterling Correctional Center, Ms. Hayes, Brian Mitchell, Sherry Seals, Warden Davenport and Ms. Greese
Case Number: 2:2010cv00286
Filed: April 1, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2012 64 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT as follows: (1) The United States Magistrate Judge's recommendation 62 is adopted. (2) Pursuant to footnote 2 in the United States Magistrate Judge's recommendation 62 , the name of defendant "Officer McKenzie" is co rrected to be defendant "Christopher Kincey" on the docket sheet and in all pleadings. (3) The motion for summary judgment 38 is granted to the extent that defendants Thomas Bailey, Lester Grimsley, Steven Canty, Christopher Kincey, Rand y Daniels, Joseph Whitehead, and Larry Peavy have been sued in their official capacities. (4) Judgment is entered in favor of defendants Bailey, Grimsley, Canty, Kincey, Daniels, Whitehead, and Peavy and against plaintiff Tyre T. Watkins to the exte nt these defendants have been sued in their official capacities, with plaintiff Watkins taking nothing to the extent he has sued these defendants in their official capacities. (5) The motion for summary judgment 38 is denied to the extent that de fendants Bailey, Canty, Kincey, and Grimsley have been sued in their individual capacities on plaintiff Watkins's excessive-force claims. (6) The motion for summary judgment 38 is denied to the extent defendants Kincey, Grimsley, Whitehead, Da niels, and Peavy have been sued in their individual capacities on plaintiff Watkinss failure-toprotect claim. (7) Plaintiff Watkinss excessive-force claims against defendants Bailey, Canty, Kincey, and Grimsley in their individual capacities will go to trial. (8) Plaintiff Watkins's failure-to-protect claim against defendants Kincey, Grimsley, Whitehead, Daniels, and Peavy in their individual capacities will go to trial. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/29/2012. (jg, )
May 3, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that on or before May 18, 2010 Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on a form for use in filing a 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint as further set out in order. The clerk is DIRECTED to furnish Plaintiff with a form for use in filing a complaint under 42 U.S.C. § 1983. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 5/3/2010. (cb, ) Modified on 5/3/2010 to notate that a 42 USC 1983 form was mailed along with order as directed. (cb, ).
April 5, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $4.11 be paid on or before April 26, 2010 ; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in f orma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Easterling Correctional Services. **Copy of order mailed to account clerk as directed**. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 4/5/2010. (cb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watkins v. Easterling Correctional Center et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyre T. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Easterling Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Seals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Greese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?