Nunn v. Thompson et al (INMATE 3)

Plaintiff: Tyrone Nunn, Sr.
Defendant: Myron H. Thompson, Wallace Capel, Jr., Leura Canary, Matthew Shepherd, Donnie Wayne Bethel, Tiffany McCord and Richard Keith
Case Number: 2:2010cv00338
Filed: April 20, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that 5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED, and this case is DISMISSED without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to pay the full filing fee upon the initiation of this case. Signed by Honorable W. Harold Albritton, III on 9/23/2010. (cb, )
July 15, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 1 Inmate 1983 Complaint filed by Tyrone Nunn, Sr. ORDERED that the 5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nunn be and is hereby DENIED. Additionally, it is the RECOMMENDATION o f the Magistrate Judge that this case be dismissed at this time without prejudice for the plaintiff's failure to pay the full filing fee upon the initiation of this case. Objections to R&R due by 7/29/2010. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 7/15/2010. (dmn)
June 16, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before 7/6/2010, the plaintiff shall either submit the $350.00 filing fee or file the appropriate affidavit in support of a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis as further set out in the order. Filing Fee due by 7/6/2010. The Clerk MAIL to the plaintiff a form for use in filing a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 6/16/2010. Copy with IFP form mailed to Plaintiff as directed. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunn v. Thompson et al (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Nunn, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myron H. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace Capel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leura Canary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donnie Wayne Bethel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?