Wallace v. Allen et al (INMATE 1)

Defendant: Richard Allen, Kenneth Jones and Steve Walker
Petitioner: James Edward Wallace
Case Number: 2:2010cv00361
Filed: April 28, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Bullock
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2013 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: It is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that: 1. The 93 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED. 2. The defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED and this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. 3. The costs of this proceeding are taxed against the plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 9/25/2013. (dmn, )
October 12, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that, upon an independent review of the file in this case and upon consideration of the 47 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that: (1) The 47 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; (2) The 46 motion for preliminary injunction filed by the plaintiff is DENIED; (3) This case is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 10/12/11. (scn, )
June 18, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that it is CONSIDERED and ORDERED as follows: (1) Plaintiff's 17 Objection to the Recommendation be and the same is hereby OVERRULED; (2) The 14 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and the same is hereby ADOPTED, APPROV ED and AFFIRMED; (3) Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction be and the same is hereby DENIED; and (4) This case be and the same is hereby REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 6/18/10. (scn, )
April 29, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Bullock County CF. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 4/29/2010. (cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Allen et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Edward Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?