Downey v. Alfa Insurance Corporation

Plaintiff: Susan Downey
Defendant: Alfa Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 2:2010cv00438
Filed: May 18, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order and for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 10/17/2011. (br, )
June 7, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the 39 Joint MOTION for Extension of Deadlines as follows: 1. The September 13, 2011 discovery deadline is extended to December 12, 2011, and the class discovery deadline is extended to December 29, 2011; 2. The September 30, 2011 de adline for motion for class certification is extended to December 29, 2011, the deadline for the response to class certification is extended to February 13, 2012, and the deadline for reply to class certification is extended to February 27, 2012; 3. The deadline for the Plaintiffs expert report is September 29, 2011, and the deadline for the Defendant's expert report is October 30, 2011. The parties are advised that this schedule will not be further extended. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 6/7/2011. (br, )
November 10, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that, for reasons discussed, the 16 Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Claims is due to be and is hereby ORDERED DENIED. Signed by Honorable W. Harold Albritton, III on 11/10/10. (scn, )
September 9, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as follows: (1) The 7 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Claims is GRANTED, to the extent that the Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice to the Plaintiff refiling her claims; and ( 2) The Plaintiff has until September 23, 2010,is complete onto itself, and which sets forth the positions to which she has been denied promotion, and/or the denial of compensation, which she alleges give her standing to seek injunctive and declaratory relief on behalf of a class, or to file a new Amended Complaint as further set out. Signed by Honorable W. Harold Albritton, III on 9/9/2010. (cb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downey v. Alfa Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Downey
Represented By: Daniel Eduardo Arciniegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?