Hendrix v. Giles et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Kenneth Wayne Hendrix
Defendant: J. C. Giles and Lt. Smith
Case Number: 2:2010cv00454
Filed: May 24, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 28, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the 43 Recommendation is adopted, and that Plf's 39 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED; further ORDERED that this action is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings and a recommendation as may be appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/28/2012. (wcl, )
November 6, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 39 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/6/2012. (wcl, )
May 26, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Ventress Correctional. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 5/26/2010. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendrix v. Giles et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wayne Hendrix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. C. Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?