Stallworth v. Kilby Correctional Facility et al (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Kinwen LaMarrow Stallworth
Defendant: Kilby Correctional Facility, John Cummins and Shirley Rogers
Case Number: 2:2010cv00469
Filed: May 26, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 17, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 25 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge; dismissing the complaint without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 2/17/2011. (br, )
September 29, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION adopting the 15 Recommendation; dismissing the claims against the Kilby Correctional Facility with prejudice prior to service; dismissing Kilby Correctional Facility as a party; referring the case back to the Magistrate for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 9/29/2010. (br, )
July 1, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION denying 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel for reasons set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 7/1/2010. (br, )
June 3, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $14.23 be paid on or before June 24, 2010; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Kilby Correctional. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 6/3/2010. (br, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stallworth v. Kilby Correctional Facility et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinwen LaMarrow Stallworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilby Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?