Johnson v. Progress Rail Services Corporation (CONSENT)
Plaintiff: Chadwick Johnson
Defendant: Progress Rail Services Corporation
Case Number: 2:2010cv00561
Filed: June 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2011 Filing 32 FINAL JUDGMENT directing that summary judgment is entered in favor of defendant and against the plaintiff on all of plaintiff's claims. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 11/10/11. (Furnished to Calendar and JT.)(Term'd: Final PTC: 03/15/2012 and Jury Trial 04/16/2012)(scn, )
November 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that defendant's #19 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 11/10/11. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(scn, )
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER directing that, upon consideration of plaintiff's oral motion to continue trial, and for good cause, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; the #17 scheduling order is AMENDED as follows: SECTION 1. A pretrial conference of this case is scheduled for March 15, 2012, at 4:30 p.m. in courtroom 5-B, Frank M. Johnson, Jr. United States Courthouse Complex, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama, as further set out; this cause is set for trial during the term of court commencing on April 16, 2012, in Montgomery, Alabama, as further set out; it is further ORDERED that a status conference is scheduled for January 4, 2012 at 3:30 p.m. in courtroom 5-B, Frank M. Johnson, Jr. United States Courthouse Complex, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 11/3/11. (Furnished to Calendar and JT.) (Term'd: Final PTC 11/07/2011 and Jury Trial 12/05/2011)(scn, )
November 2, 2011 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker: Status Conference held on 11/2/2011 (PDF available for court use only). (Recording Time 2:50 - 3:00.) (jct, )
November 2, 2011 ORAL MOTION to Continue Trial by Chadwick Johnson. (jct, )
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER directing that a status conference is scheduled for 3:00 p.m. on November 2, 2011, in courtroom 5-B, Frank M. Johnson, Jr. United States Courthouse Complex, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama; the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to call plaintiff and advise him of the date and time of the status conference. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 10/27/11. (Furnished to Calendar and JT.)(scn, )
October 17, 2011 Filing 27 Witness List by Progress Rail Services Corporation. (Bostick, Brian)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER directing that, upon consideration of E. Peyton Faulk's #22 motion to withdraw, and for good cause, it is ORDERED that the motion be and hereby is GRANTED, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 9/12/11. (scn, )
September 12, 2011 *** Attorney Elizabeth Peyton Faulk terminated pursuant to #26 Order. (No PDF attached to this entry.) (scn, )
August 23, 2011 Filing 25 Notice of Mediation and Settlement Conference by Progress Rail Services Corporation and Chadwick Johnson (Bostick, Brian) Modified on 8/24/2011 to reflect filing on behalf of both parties (qc/scn, ).
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER directing that the #22 Motion for extension of time is GRANTED to the extent that plaintiff's deadline for responding to the pending motion for summary judgment, presently set for August 23, 2011, is extended until September 23, 2011; the motion for extension of time is DENIED in all other respects; further ORDERED that, if plaintiff files a response to the motion for summary judgment, defendant's reply brief shall be filed no later than eleven calendar days thereafter; the parties are DIRECTED to provide a bound and tabbed courtesy copy of each of their summary judgment submissions to the court, in chambers, on or before October 7, 2011; further ORDERED that plaintiff is DIRECTED to respond, in writing, to his attorney's #22 motion to withdraw as counsel on or before August 31, 2011; the Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this order to the plaintiff at the address indicated on the certificate of service attached to the motion to withdraw. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 8/22/11. (scn, )
August 17, 2011 Filing 23 NOTICE of PDF Correction re #22 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney to reflect correction to certificate of service. (Attachments: #1 Corrected main document of Docket Entry #22 )(scn, )
August 16, 2011 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, by Chadwick Johnson. (No PDF document attached to this motion; see #22 docket entry (qc/scn, )
August 16, 2011 Filing 22 MOTION for Elizabeth Faulk to Withdraw as Attorney by Chadwick Johnson. (Faulk, Elizabeth) (Main Document 22 replaced on 8/17/2011 to reflect correction to certificate of service) (qc/scn, ).
August 2, 2011 Filing 21 Evidentiary Submission re #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Progress Rail Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - part 1 of 4, #2 Exhibit A - part 2 of 4, #3 Exhibit A - part 3 of 4, #4 Exhibit A - part 4 of 4, #5 Exhibit B - part 1 of 3, #6 Exhibit B - part 2 of 3, #7 Exhibit B - part 3 of 3)(Bostick, Brian)
August 2, 2011 Filing 20 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Progress Rail Services Corporation. (Bostick, Brian)
August 2, 2011 Filing 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Progress Rail Services Corporation. (Bostick, Brian)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER directing that (1) The moving party shall file its brief and evidentiary submission simultaneously with the motion for summary judgment; (2) The opponent's brief and responsive submission shall be filed not later than 21 days thereafter; (3) The movant's reply brief shall be filed not later than 11 calendar days after the date on which the opponent's responsive submission was due. The movant may not include any new evidentiary material with the reply brief without prior leave of court; (4) Briefs must contain a statement of facts including specific references to the record. The court will not consider documents or parts of documents that have not been specifically cited by page number. Upon conclusion of the submission schedule, the court will take the motion under submission without oral argument. If the court determines that oral argument is necessary, it will set a hearing date. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 10/14/10. (scn, )
October 14, 2010 Filing 17 UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER setting: Final Pretrial Conference for 11/7/2011 at 04:30 PM in chambers before Honorable Susan Russ Walker; Jury Trial set for 12/5/2011 term of court in Montgomery, Alabama, before Honorable Susan Russ Walker; Dispositive Motions due by 8/3/2011; Mediation Notice due by 8/29/2011; Amended Pleadings due by 1/5/2011; Discovery due by 10/24/2011, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 10/14/10. (Furnished to Calendar and JT.)(scn, )
August 19, 2010 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Chadwick Johnson. (scn, )
August 19, 2010 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Progress Rail Services Corporation. (scn, )
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER directing that the parties are DIRECTED to execute and file, on or before September 1, 2010 either the attached form consenting to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction or the form requesting reassignment to a District Judge, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 8/17/10. (scn, )
August 6, 2010 Filing 13 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #12 Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order as follows: the parties are DIRECTED to comply with the terms of their Protective Agreement, which is hereby ADOPTED and set forth as a PROTECTIVE ORDER entered pursuant to Rule 26(c) of the FRCP, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 8/6/10. (scn, )
August 6, 2010 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge mailed to counsel for Plaintiff Chadwick Johnson and Defendant Progress Rail Services Corporation. (No PDF document attached to this notice.) (scn, )
July 26, 2010 NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re #12 Joint MOTION for Protective Order to reflect JOINT status on behalf of both parties. (NO PDF document attached to this notice.) (scn, )
July 23, 2010 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Progress Rail Services Corporation and Chadwick Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order)(Bostick, Brian) Modified on 7/26/2010 to reflect joint status on behalf of both parties (qc/scn, ).
July 23, 2010 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bostick, Brian)
July 8, 2010 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Progress Rail Services Corporation. (Bostick, Brian)
June 30, 2010 Filing 9 Case transferred in from Northern District of Alabama; Case Number CV-10-BE-1392-M. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.(scn, )
June 28, 2010 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Progress Rail Services Corporation.(scn, )
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER transferring case to another district: ORDER transferring case to the Middle District of Alabama; original electronic record will be electronically mailed to Clerk of Court 10 business days from this date. Signed by Judge Karen O. Bowdre on 06/16/10. (scn, )
June 15, 2010 Filing 6 First MOTION to Change Venue Motion to Transfer Venue to the Middle District of Alabama by Chadwick Johnson. (scn, )
June 9, 2010 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chadwick Johnson. Progress Rail Services Corporation served on 6/8/2010, answer due 6/29/2010. (scn, )
June 7, 2010 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Progress Rail Services Corporation and mailed via certified mail. (scn, )
June 3, 2010 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Chadwick Johnson. (scn, )
June 3, 2010 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Chadwick Johnson. (scn, )
June 3, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Progress Rail Services Corporation ( Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number USND # B4601012817.), filed by Chadwick Johnson.(scn, )
June 3, 2010 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff Chadwick Johnson. (No PDF attached; see Docket Entry #1 .) (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Progress Rail Services Corporation (CONSENT)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progress Rail Services Corporation
Represented By: Brian Roberts Bostick
Represented By: Gordon Liddell Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chadwick Johnson
Represented By: Elizabeth Peyton Faulk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?