Moore v. Saddings et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Eugene Moore
Defendant: Dr. Saddings, Mrs. Penn and Dr. Andrews
Case Number: 2:2010cv00568
Filed: July 1, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT that this case be DISMISSED for the plaintiff's failure to properly prosecute this action. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 1/28/2011. (br, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/28/2011: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist) (br, ).
October 7, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that on or before October 27, 2010 the plaintiff shall file a response to the written reports filed by the defendants. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 10/7/2010. (cb, )
July 23, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. 2 :10-cv-631-TMH)in except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Bullock Correctional Facility.. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 7/23/2010. (cb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Saddings et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Saddings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Penn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?