Ausar-El v. BAC (Bank of America) Home Loans Servicing, LP

Plaintiff: Charles Nu Ausar-El
Defendant: BAC (Bank of America) Home Loans Servicing, LP
Case Number: 2:2010cv00569
Filed: July 1, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Elmore
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 1/26/2011. (br, )
December 20, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the 14 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge; granting the 6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 12/20/2010. (br, )
November 22, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that: (1) Defendant's 6 Motion to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) be GRANTED as to all counts; (2) Plaintiff's claims be DISMISSED; (3) Any other outstanding motions be DENIED as moot. Objections to R&R due by 12/7/2010. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 11/22/2010. Modified on 1/5/2011 (br, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ausar-El v. BAC (Bank of America) Home Loans Servicing, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Nu Ausar-El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC (Bank of America) Home Loans Servicing, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?