Iacullo v. United States of America et al (INMATE3)

Plaintiff: Dino Iacullo
Defendant: United States of America, C. J. Gavarrete, J. Davis and Dr. Berrios
Case Number: 2:2010cv00589
Filed: July 9, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2017 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) ADOPTING 114 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; (2) denying 24 Motion for Summary Judgment; referring action back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/24/17. (djy, )
April 11, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that, after an independent review of the file, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that: (1) The plaintiff's Motion to Strike (Doc. # 69 ), which the Court construes as an Objection to the Recommendation of the Magi strate Judge, filed on March 20, 2014 is overruled; (2) The Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge (Doc. # 65 ) entered on March 12, 2014 is adopted; (3) That the government's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED and the claims asserted against the government are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 4/11/14. (scn, )
April 8, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that, after an independent review of the file, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that: (1) The plaintiff's objection (Doc. # 70 ) to the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is overruled; (2) The Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge (Doc. # 65 ) is adopted; (3) The government's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED and the claims asserted against the government are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 4/8/14. (scn, )
July 19, 2010 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that (1) on or before August 9, 2010 the plaintiff shall either submit the $350.00 filing fee or file the appropriate affidavit in support of a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, as further set out; and (2) the Clerk MAIL to the plaintiff a form for use in filing a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 7/19/10. (Form mailed to Plaintiff with Order.)(scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iacullo v. United States of America et al (INMATE3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dino Iacullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. J. Gavarrete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Berrios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?