Sewell v. United States of America (INMATE3)

Plaintiff: Timothy Jevon Sewell
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2010cv00658
Filed: July 30, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that: (1) The petitioner's 28 Objection to the Magistrate Judge Recommendation is overruled; (2) The 25 Recommendation of the US Magistrate Judge is adopted; (3) The § 2255 motion is DENIED and this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 8/9/2012. (wcl, )
June 15, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before July 7, 2011, Sewell shall show cause why his 28 U.S.C. § 2255 motion should not be dismissed as it was not filed within the one-year limitation period for filing § 2255 motions, and for the other reasons set forth by the government in its supplemental answer. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 6/15/2011. (br, )
April 19, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION granting 13 Motion to Hold in Abeyance; this court's determination of the issues presented in the § 2255 motion shall be held in abeyance pending the en banc Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeal's decision in Gilbert v. United States. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 4/19/2011. (br, )
September 15, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion for Extension of Time; that the Petitioner be GRANTED an extension from August 25, 2010, to and including September 30, 2010, to comply with the court's order of August 4th as further set out; that the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to provide Petitioner with the form used for filing a motion to vacate, set aside, or correct sentence pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255; and that 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED. **Copy of 2255 for mailed along with this order as directed** Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 9/15/2010. (cb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sewell v. United States of America (INMATE3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Jevon Sewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Todd A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?