Anderson v. Allen (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Billy W. Anderson
Defendant: Richard Allen
Case Number: 2:2010cv00693
Filed: August 16, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Elmore
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2013 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION that: 1. Defendants' motions for summary judgment 28 , 39 are GRANTED; 2. Judgment is ENTERED in favor of defendants against plaintiff;3. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice; and 4. Costs are TAXED against plaintiff for which execution may issue. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 6/19/2013. (jg, )
December 15, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION; that Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel 31 , is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 12/15/2010. (jg, )
September 29, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; that on or before October 19, 2010 Plaintiff shall file an amendedcomplaint on a form for use in filing a 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint as further set out; that the Clerk is DIRECTED to furnish Plaintiff with a form for use in filing a complaint under 42 U.S.C. § 1983. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 9/29/2010. (jg, ) Form mailed to plaintiff as directed
September 16, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; that Plaintiff is to file an amended complaint on or before October 1, 2010, on a form for use in filing a 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint as further set out; that the Clerk is DIRECTED to send to Plaintiff a form for use in filing a complaint under § 1983. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 9/16/2010. (jg, )
August 24, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $10.04 be paid on or before September 14, 2010; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 3 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at the Draper Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 8/24/2010. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Allen (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy W. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?