Moorer v. Caroline Steel Group, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Anthony B. Moorer
Defendant: Caroline Steel Group, LLC and Ramsey Bowman
Case Number: 2:2010cv00705
Filed: August 19, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 Motion for appointment of counsel, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 11/7/11. (djy, )
November 4, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the plf may response to the 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment on or before 12/5/2011; the defendant may file a Reply Brief on or before 12/19/2011, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 11/4/11. (djy, )
August 31, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; plf is advised that if he fails either to renew his motion or pay the filing fee by 9/13/2010 this action may be dismissed, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 8/31/10. (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moorer v. Caroline Steel Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony B. Moorer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroline Steel Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramsey Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?