Spears v. Boyd et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: William H. Spears
Defendant: Louis Boyd and R. Foss
Case Number: 2:2010cv00748
Filed: September 7, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION adopting the 12 Recommendation; dismissing the case without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 1/13/2011. (br, ) Modified on 1/13/2011 to correct text (br, ).
November 4, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that on or before November 29, 2010 Plaintiff shall file a response toDefendants' answers and written reports. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 11/4/2010. (cb, )
September 9, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $1.83 be paid on or before on September 30, 2010 ; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk Easterling Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 9/9/2010. (cb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spears v. Boyd et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William H. Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Foss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?