Quality First Produce, Inc. v. State Line Produce, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Quality First Produce, Inc.
Defendant: State Line Produce, LLC, James Thrasher and Wayne Headley
Case Number: 2:2010cv00769
Filed: September 13, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Agricultural Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 23, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that defendant James Thrasher is dismissed without prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/23/2011. (br, )
January 24, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion for Entry of Default; entering default in favor of plaintiff Quality First Produce, Inc. and against defendant State Line Produce, LLC; setting the issue of damages for submission without oral argument on 2/7/2011 as further set out. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 1/24/2011. (br, )
November 30, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that defendant Wayne Headley and the claims against him are dismissed with prejudice. This case still remains pending as to the other defendants. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 11/30/2010. (br, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quality First Produce, Inc. v. State Line Produce, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quality First Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Bulgarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Line Produce, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Thrasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Headley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?