Griffin v. Riley et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Kenneth R. Griffin
Defendant: Bob Riley, Troy King, J. Christopher Murphy, Richard Allen, Kathy Holt and Carolyn Golson
Case Number: 2:2010cv00771
Filed: September 14, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Elmore
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED as follows that: 1. Plaintiffs requests for declaratory and permanent injunctive relief (doc. 1 )be and are hereby DENIED as moot. 2. Plaintiffs challenges to the Alabama Community Notificatio n Act be and are hereby DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. 3. Defendants motion for summary judgment with respect to Plaintiffs remaining claims pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1983 (doc. 22 ) be and is hereby GRANTED on jurisdictional grounds. 4. Plaintiffs state law claims be and are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. 5. This case be and is hereby DISMISSED. 6. No costs are taxed herein. A separate order will enter. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/8/2013. (dmn, )
December 8, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER directing that the 1 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by the plaintiff be DENIED, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 12/8/10. (scn, )
September 15, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $13.10 be paid on or before October 15, 2010; Directing Monthly Payments of 20% of each proceeding month's income and/or funds credited to Plaintiff's account as payments to wards the $350 filing fee; directing the Clerk to furnish a copy of this order to the account clerk at the Elmore Correctional facility; further ORDERED that except to the extent payment is required under this order, the plaintiff's 2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is hereby GRANTED, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 9/15/10. ( Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk) (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Riley et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth R. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Christopher Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Golson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?