McKenzie v. Riley et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Charles C. McKenzie
Defendant: Bob Riley, Troy King, J. Christopher Murphy, Richard Allen, Kathy Holt and Carolyn Golson
Case Number: 2:2010cv00782
Filed: September 17, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Elmore
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 10 Recommendation. Plaintiff's 1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction be DENIED; and this case be referred back to the undersigned for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 12/3/2010. (dmn)
October 27, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION: 17 Motion for Appointment of Counsel is DENIED as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 10/27/2010. (dmn)
October 15, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Plaintiff's 1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction be DENIED. It is further the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge that this case be referred back to the undersigned for additional proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 10/28/2010. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 10/15/2010. (dmn)
September 21, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order as further set out. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at the Elmore Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 9/21/2010. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKenzie v. Riley et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles C. McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Christopher Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Golson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?