Barley v. Riley et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Daniel M. Barley
Defendant: Bob Riley, Troy King, J. Christopher Murphy, Richard Allen, Kathy Holt and Carolyn Golson
Case Number: 2:2010cv00798
Filed: September 22, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Elmore
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that: 1) The plf's requests for declaratory and permanent injunctive relief (Doc. No. 1 at 13) be DENIED as moot; 2) The plf's claims challenging actions which occurred prior to his return to prison in August of 2008 be DISMISSED with prejudice as the plf failed to file the complaint within the time prescribed by the applicable period of limitation; 3) The plf's challenges to the Alabama Community Notification Act with res pect to actions which occurred on or after 9/20/2008 be DISMISSED with prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; 4) The plf's claim seeking tiered classification of the sex offender registry be DISMISSED with prejudice as this claim pro vides no basis for relief; 5) The plf's state law claims be DISMISSED without prejudice as the court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over any such claims; 6) The dfts' motion for summary judgment with respect to the plf's federal claims for relief be GRANTED; 7) This case be DISMISSED; and 8) No costs are taxed herein; A separate Final Judgment will accompany this memorandum opinion. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 9/11/2013. (wcl, )
December 6, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the 24 Recommendation; denying the Motion for Preliminary Injunction embedded in the 1 complaint. Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 12/6/2010. (br, )
November 9, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that: (1) The 1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction be DENIED; and (2) This case be referred back the undersigned for additional proceedings. It is further ORDERED that on or before November 23, 2010 the parties may file objections to the Recommendation. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 11/9/2010. (cb, )
September 28, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at the Elmore Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 9/28/2010. (cb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barley v. Riley et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel M. Barley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Christopher Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Golson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?