Fortner v. Canty et al (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Darelle Fortner
Defendant: Steven Canty, Lt. Woods, Captain Barbers, Kenneth Sconyers and Louis Boyd
Case Number: 2:2010cv00809
Filed: September 24, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the 23 Recommendation; dismissing the case with prejudice. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 3/16/2011. (br, )
January 4, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the 14 Report and Recommendations; granting the 8 Motion to Dismiss Defendants Woods, Barbers, Sconyers, and Boyd; dismissing the same defendants with prejudice; referring the case back to the Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 1/4/2011. (br, )
December 15, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that the 8 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Woods, Barbers, Sconyers, and Boyd be GRANTED; that Defendants Woods, Barbers, Sconyers, and Boyd be DISMISSED with prejudice as parties to this complaint; and that this case with respect to the remaining defendants be referred back to the undersigned for additional proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 12/29/2010. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 12/15/2010. (br, )
September 27, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $7.56 be paid on or before October 18, 2010; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Easterling Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 9/27/2010. (br, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fortner v. Canty et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Canty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Barbers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Sconyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darelle Fortner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?