Taylor v. Smithart et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: |
Glen Taylor |
Defendant: |
Burt Smithart, Wilbert M. Jernigan, Len Coughran and Jim Kirkland |
Case Number: |
2:2010cv01057 |
Filed: |
December 13, 2010 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Alabama |
Office: |
Montgomery Office |
County: |
Escambia |
Presiding Judge: |
Ira De Ment |
Presiding Judge: |
Susan Russ Walker |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 30, 2011 |
Filing
9
ORDER; 1. Petitioner's objections 6 and 8 be and the same are hereby OVERRULED; 2. The recommendations of the Magistrate Judge 5 and 7 be and the same are hereby ADOPTED, APPROVED and AFFIRMED; 3. Plaintiff's 42 U.S.C. § 1983 c omplaint against the named defendants be and the same is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i)-(iii); 4. Plaintiff's challenge to the constitutionality of his current incarceration be and the same is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice as further set out in order; 5. Plaintiff's complaint, to the extent it may be construed as a writ of mandamus, be and the same is hereby DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction; 6. Plaintiffs ac tion, to the extent it is considered a complaint for declaratory judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2201 and Rule 57 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, be and the same is hereby DENIED pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2 )(B)(i)-(ii) and DISMISSED prior to service of process; and 7. This case be and the same is hereby DISMISSED prior to service of process in accordance with the directives of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i)-(iii). Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 3/30/2011. (jg, )
|
December 16, 2010 |
Filing
3
ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $1.33 be paid on or before 1/6/2011; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Fountain Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 12/16/2010. (wcl, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?