Koninklijke Ahold, N.V. v. Millbrook Commons, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Koninklijke Ahold, N.V.
Defendant: Millbrook Commons, LLC, Karen D. Stephens and Milton G. Domit Limited Liability Company
Case Number: 2:2010cv01060
Filed: December 13, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as follows: 1. Millbrooks Motion for Reasonable Attorneys Fees and Costs of Litigation or, in the Alternative, Motion to Alter or Amend the final judgment in this case (Doc. 61 ) is DENIED as further set out in the order; 2. Aholds Motion to Alter or Amend the final judgment in this case (Doc. 65 ) is DENIED as further set out in the order; and 3. Millbrooks Motion for Certificate of Appealability (Doc. 63 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 8/8/2013. (dmn, )
January 17, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that, upon consideration of Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff Millbrook Commons' ("Millbrook") 69 Renewed Motion to Extend Time for Filing Notice of Appeal, and pursuant to this Court's authority under FRCP Rule 5 8, the Court finds that the motion is due to be GRANTED; accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that: (1) Millbrook's 69 Renewed Motion to Extend Time for Filing Notice of Appeal is GRANTED; (2) The deadline for filing a Notice of Appeal in the abo ve-styled action is EXTENDED until seven (7) days after the Court enters an order ruling on Millbrook's pending 61 Motion for Reasonable Attorneys' Fees and Costs of Litigation, or, in the Alternative, Motion to Alter or Amend. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 1/17/13. (scn, )
January 15, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 66 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief; Millbrook shall file its reply brief on or before Friday, January 18, 2013. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 1/15/13. (scn, )
December 18, 2012 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that: (1) Millbrook's 63 Motion to Extend Time for Filing Notice of Appeal is GRANTED as further set out in the order, and; (2) the deadline for filing a Notice of Appeal action is EXTENDED through and including 1/20/2012. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 12/18/2012. (dmn, )
September 12, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that: (1) Millbrook Commons may not seek recovery of any rent past August 10, 2009, the date the Triple N lease was entered into, because Bruno's breach of the lease constituted an abandonment, and because § 16.01 is inapplicable to abandonments; (2) The "two-dismissal" rule does not bar Millbrook Commons from recovering under the Guaranty; and, (3) Section 6-5-280 of the Alabama Code does not bar Millbrook Commons from recovering under the Guaranty; further ORDERED that: (3) Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant Koninklijke Ahold's 31 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; and, (4) Defendants/Counterclaim Plaintiffs Millbrook Commons' (and the Successors') 34 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 9/12/12. (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koninklijke Ahold, N.V. v. Millbrook Commons, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Koninklijke Ahold, N.V.
Represented By: Douglas P. Baumstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millbrook Commons, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen D. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milton G. Domit Limited Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?