Barbaree v. Meeks et al (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Michael Dayle Barbaree
Defendant: Preston Hughes and Dennis Meeks
Case Number: 2:2010cv01073
Filed: December 17, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER that the 44 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and is hereby ADOPTED, and that this case be and is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(a) and for the Plaintiffs failure to comply with the orders of this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 8/28/2012. (jg, )
April 11, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ; that on or before May 2, 2011 Plaintiff shall file a response to 21 Defendants' written report. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 4/11/2011. (jg, )
March 9, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION; that Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel 15 , is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 3/9/2011. (jg, )
March 4, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION; that Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel 13 , is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 3/4/2011. (jg, )
January 13, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $12.83 be paid on or before February 3, 2011; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at the Kilby Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 1/13/2011. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barbaree v. Meeks et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preston Hughes
Represented By: Gary Lee Willford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Meeks
Represented By: Gary Lee Willford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dayle Barbaree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?