Turpin v. Pittman et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Exie Lee Turpin
Defendant: Mrs. Pittman and Mrs. Chitty
Case Number: 2:2010cv01094
Filed: December 27, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing as follows: 1) Plf's 10 Objection be and the same is hereby OVERRULED; 2) The 8 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and the same is hereby ADOPTED, APPROVED and AFFIRMED; 3) The Plf's claims against the Alabama Dep artment of Corrections, Classification Division, be DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process pursuant to the provisions of 28 USC § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); 4) The Alabama Department of Corrections, Classification Division, be DISMISSED as a party to this complaint; and 5) This case with respect to the remaining dfts be referred back to the United States Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 2/7/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist) (wcl, )
January 20, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that on or before 2/3/2011, plf shall file an amended complaint, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 1/20/11. (djy, )
January 4, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $20.43 be paid on or before 1/25/2011; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Ventress Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 1/4/2011. (furn: Cashier) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turpin v. Pittman et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Exie Lee Turpin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Pittman
Represented By: Todd E Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Chitty
Represented By: Todd E Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?