Sutton v. Allen et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Ronald Sutton
Defendant: State Dietician for A.D.O.C., Luther Strange and Kim Tobias Thomas
Case Number: 2:2011cv00021
Filed: January 7, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Limestone
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 18, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as follows: 1. Mr. Sutton's objections (Doc. 72 , 76 , & 77 ) are OVERRULED; 2. The 63 Recommendation is ADOPTED; 3. Defendants' motions for summary judgment are GRANTED; 4. Mr. Sutton's 76 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction is DENIED; and 5. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. A separate final judgment will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 2/18/2014. (dmn, )
February 24, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the 28 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED as follows: (1) The motion for preliminary injunction filed by Plaintiff is DENIED, and (2) The case is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 2/24/11. (scn, )
January 11, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Monthly Payments of 20% of each proceeding month's income credited to his account be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; directing that those persons having custody of the plaintiff shall forwar d the above-described payments from the plaintiff's account to the clerk of this court each time the amount in the plaintiff's account exceeds $10.00 until the fee is paid in full; granting 3 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma p auperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; directing the Clerk of Court to furnish a copy of this order to the inmate account clerk at the Limestone Correctional Facility. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 1/11/11. (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sutton v. Allen et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Dietician for A.D.O.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luther Strange
Represented By: Scott Lee Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Tobias Thomas
Represented By: Scott Lee Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?