Hayes v. Alabama Department of Corrections Commissioner et al (INMATE 1) (LEAD CASE)

Plaintiff: Nathaniel Hayes
Defendant: Ms. Lawson, Taurean Crawford, Douglass McKinney, Alabama Department of Corrections Commissioner, John Cummins and Capt. Napier
Case Number: 2:2011cv00038
Filed: January 14, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2011 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION construing the 96 motion to contain a motion for immediate adjudication; denying 96 Motion for Immediate Adjudication. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 12/7/2011. (br, )
June 15, 2011 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION denying 86 Motion for leave to Conduct Discovery. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/15/2011. (br, )
March 21, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION denying 61 Motion to Amend. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 3/21/2011. (br, )
March 7, 2011 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that: 1. In accordance with the 6 order of procedure the defendants shall file as exhibits to their written report: (i) copies of all institutional documents regarding the plaintiff's placement in segregation at Kilby in December of 2010 , including administrative regulations, reports and classification reviews, relevant to the issues raised in the complaint, and (ii) affidavits from the defendants and/or other correctional personnel with personal knowledge of the claims raised by th e plaintiff challenging his placement in segregation; Defendant McKinney is GRANTED an extension from March 14, 2011 to and including March 31, 2011 to file his response to interrogatories as directed by the 40 order; All other requests for discovery sought by the plaintiff are DENIED as either irrelevant and/or overly burdensome; the motion to stay discovery filed by the defendants is DENIED as moot. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 3/7/2011. (br, )
March 1, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to substitute Taurean Crawford for Taweaun Crawford; directing the Clerk to serve a copy of the complaint, amendments to the complaint, the 6 order of procedure, and this order on Taurean Crawford at the address contained in the 52 sealed response; granting Crawford an extension to and including March 31, 2011 to file his/her written report and answer. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 3/1/2011. (br, )
February 17, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER overruling 34 Objection; adopting the 25 Recommendation; denying the 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; referring the case back to the Magistrate for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 2/17/2011. (br, )
February 8, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that on or before 2/23/2011 the dfts shall allow the plf to inspect and/or copy all documents contained in his inmate medical/mental health files, as further set out in order; DIRECTING the Clerk to provide a copy of this order to the dfts, General Counsel for the AL DOC and the medical director of the health care unit at the Kilby Correctional Center. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 2/8/2011. (wcl, )
February 7, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that on or before 3/4/2011 the dfts shall object or otherwise respond to the interrogatories/discovery requests (docs. 28 , 29 , 30 ) filed by the plf; further ORDERED that the plf shall file no further discovery requests without first obtaining leave of this court. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 2/7/2011. Copy mailed to dfts. (wcl, )
February 2, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to file a response in which he provides the court with either a first name for officer Jenkins or a detailed description of this officer so that service can be perfected on this individual. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 2/2/2011. (br, )
January 25, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION denying 16 Motion for appointment of counsel. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 1/25/2011. (br, )
January 19, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 4 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at the Kilby Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 1/19/2011. (br, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes v. Alabama Department of Corrections Commissioner et al (INMATE 1) (LEAD CASE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Lawson
Represented By: Mary Arrington Goldthwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taurean Crawford
Represented By: Mary Arrington Goldthwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglass McKinney
Represented By: Mary Arrington Goldthwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections Commissioner
Represented By: Mary Arrington Goldthwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cummins
Represented By: Mary Arrington Goldthwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Napier
Represented By: Mary Arrington Goldthwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?