Yeager v. Hardy et al (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Robert Terrell Yeager
Defendant: A. J. Hardy and Assistant Warden Hopkins
Case Number: 2:2011cv00039
Filed: January 14, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Elmore
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION denying 12 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 3/7/2011. (br, )
February 23, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 7 Recommendations, dismissing the claims against Montgomery City Jail with prejudice, prior to service of process, pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); referring the case back to the Magistrate for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 2/23/2011. (br, )
January 20, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk Elmore County Jail. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 1/20/2011. (br, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yeager v. Hardy et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Terrell Yeager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. J. Hardy
Represented By: Jason Cole Paulk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assistant Warden Hopkins
Represented By: Jason Cole Paulk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?