Anderson v. Georgia-Pacific Wood Products, LLC

Plaintiff: Larry Anderson
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific Wood Products, LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv00110
Filed: February 15, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Chilton
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Coody
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12102
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that Defendant's 79 motion is GRANTED to the extent that it requests its expert disclosure deadline be extended from the present deadline of February 1, 2013, to a later date, but it is DENIED to the extent that it requests an expert disclosure deadline through and including April 24, 2013; Defendant shall make its expert disclosures pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(2) on or before April 10, 2013. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 1/15/13. (scn, )
November 13, 2012 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that Defendant's 73 motion is GRANTED; Defendant shall file its reply brief on or before November 27, 2012. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 11/13/12. (scn, )
November 2, 2012 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that Defendant's 59 Motion is DENIED with leave to refile its motion with specific arguments and supporting legal precedent as to why certain exhibits and portions of its dispositive motion should be placed under seal; the Clerk of Court is hereby DIRECTED to UNSEAL Defendant's 58 Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment and any accompanying exhibits. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 11/2/12. (scn, )
October 24, 2012 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that Plaintiff's 67 Motion to Extend Summary Judgment Briefing Deadlines is GRANTED; the briefing schedule for the 61 dispositive motions in this case is hereby AMENDED as follows: (1) Plaintiff shall file its response to Defendant's 57 motion for summary judgment on or before November 2, 2012; and (2) Defendant shall file its reply brief on or before November 13, 2012, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 10/24/12. (scn, )
July 23, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that Georgia-Pacific's 39 motion to compel be and is hereby granted; further, Anderson is ORDERED to complete the additional authorization needed for the release of his VA medical records, including mental health, therapy, and/or substance abuse treatment records, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 7/23/12. (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Georgia-Pacific Wood Products, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Anderson
Represented By: Lee David Winston
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific Wood Products, LLC
Represented By: Randall D. Avram
Represented By: Thomas Heflin Christopher
Represented By: Richard D Haygood
Represented By: Efrain A. Poloche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?