Guy v. Sconyers et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Harold Guy
Defendant: Kenneth Sconyers, Brian Mitchell, Sherry Seals and Jameka Caffie
Case Number: 2:2011cv00130
Filed: February 24, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 17, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 8 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED and this case is DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process pursuant to the directives of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (ii). A separate judgment shall issue. Signed by Honorable Judge Ira De Ment on 6/17/2011. (dmn)
March 14, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 4 Motion for additional time to submit the initial partial filing fee directing that: (1) Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED; (2) Plaintiff is GRANTED an extension from March 22, 2011 to and including April 1, 2011 to comply with the court's 3 Order that he submit an initial partial filing fee; the Clerk is DIRECTED to furnish a copy of this order to the account clerk at the Easterling Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 3/14/11. (scn, )
March 1, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; further ORDERED that on or before March 22, 2011 Plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of this Court the sum of $7.33 a s an initial partial filing fee, as further set out; further ORDERED that Monthly Payments of 20% of each preceding month's income and/or funds credited to his account be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full, as further set out; the Clerk is DIRECTED to furnish a copy of this order to the account clerk at the Easterling Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 3/1/11. (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guy v. Sconyers et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Guy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Sconyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Seals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jameka Caffie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?